THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:13:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 311
1333 Sheppard Ave East
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-740-1333
Fax: 416-740-8702

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Robson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Oct 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 311
1333 Sheppard Ave East
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-740-1333
Fax: 416-740-8702

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Robson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Oct 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL GUY ROBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL GUY ROBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jul 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2004