THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:27:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 Georgian Drive
Royal Victoria Health Centre
Dept. of Pathology
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-728-9090
Extension: 42323
Fax: 705-739-5685

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematological Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Hematology
Effective: 21 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 May 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematological Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: LR Shier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Shier (CPSO#: 81559 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 Georgian Drive
Royal Victoria Health Centre
Dept. of Pathology
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-728-9090
Extension: 42323
Fax: 705-739-5685

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematological Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Hematology
Effective: 21 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 May 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematological Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: LR Shier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Shier (CPSO#: 81559 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUKE RAYMOND SHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUKE RAYMOND SHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2012
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004