THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:28:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2000 Argentia Road
Plaza 4
Unit 101
NeuPath Centres for Pain & Spine
Mississauga Ontario L5N 1W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 288 1045
Fax: 905 858 2144

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tavis J. Basford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Basford (CPSO#: 81560 )
Business Address: 347 Colborne Street
Brantford Ontario N3S 3N2
(519) 754-2893
Business Address: 4646 Dufferin Street
North York Ontario M3H 5S4
(416) 512-6407
Business Address: Suite 6
2125 Wyecroft Road
Oakville Ontario L6L 5L7
(905) 842-7051

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2000 Argentia Road
Plaza 4
Unit 101
NeuPath Centres for Pain & Spine
Mississauga Ontario L5N 1W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 288 1045
Fax: 905 858 2144

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tavis J. Basford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Basford (CPSO#: 81560 )
Business Address: 347 Colborne Street
Brantford Ontario N3S 3N2
(519) 754-2893
Business Address: 4646 Dufferin Street
North York Ontario M3H 5S4
(416) 512-6407
Business Address: Suite 6
2125 Wyecroft Road
Oakville Ontario L6L 5L7
(905) 842-7051

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAVIS JAMES BASFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASFORD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAVIS JAMES BASFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASFORD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004