THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:22:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Patient Networks
157 Yonge St
Toronto Ontario M5C 1X7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 362-8822
Fax: (416) 362-8877

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. So Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. B. So (CPSO#: 81569 )
Business Address: 157 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M5C 1X7
416-362-8822
Business Address: 157 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M5C 1X7
416-362-8822

Corporation Name: Boris So Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. B. So (CPSO#: 81569 )
Business Address: 157 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M5C 1X7
416-362-8822

Corporation Name: Boris So Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Oct 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Patient Networks
157 Yonge St
Toronto Ontario M5C 1X7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 362-8822
Fax: (416) 362-8877

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. So Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. B. So (CPSO#: 81569 )
Business Address: 157 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M5C 1X7
416-362-8822
Business Address: 157 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M5C 1X7
416-362-8822

Corporation Name: Boris So Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. B. So (CPSO#: 81569 )
Business Address: 157 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M5C 1X7
416-362-8822

Corporation Name: Boris So Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Oct 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BORIS SO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BORIS SO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004