THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:52:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 309 Sheppard Ave East
Suite 201
Toronto Ontario M2N 3B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-340-7601
Fax: 647-340-7612
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd.
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: 416-747-3469
Fax: 416-747-3344

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 26 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Layla Safinia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Safinia (CPSO#: 81580 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Room 060
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3469
Business Address: 201 - 309 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2N 3B3
(647) 340-7601

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 309 Sheppard Ave East
Suite 201
Toronto Ontario M2N 3B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-340-7601
Fax: 647-340-7612
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd.
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: 416-747-3469
Fax: 416-747-3344

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 26 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Layla Safinia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Safinia (CPSO#: 81580 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Room 060
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3469
Business Address: 201 - 309 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2N 3B3
(647) 340-7601

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAYLA SAFINIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFINIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAYLA SAFINIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFINIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004