THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:56:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 596 Davis Dr
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 653 Queen Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2J1
Phone: 905-967-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kristin James Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. James (CPSO#: 81591 )
Business Address: 653 Queen Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2J1
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 596 Davis Dr
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 653 Queen Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2J1
Phone: 905-967-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kristin James Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. James (CPSO#: 81591 )
Business Address: 653 Queen Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2J1
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTIN DANIELLE JAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTIN DANIELLE JAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 May 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004