THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:24:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St.
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-2041
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 12 Nov 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Berliner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Berliner (CPSO#: 81594 )
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-2041

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St.
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-2041
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 12 Nov 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Berliner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Berliner (CPSO#: 81594 )
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-2041

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YANIV BERLINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERLINER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YANIV BERLINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERLINER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004