THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:21:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad De Cartagena, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 313
145 Government Road East
Kirkland Lake Ontario P2N 3P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 568-2131
Fax: (705) 568-2133

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Antonio Visbal Moreno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Visbal Moreno (CPSO#: 81624 )
Business Address: 313 - 145 Government Road East
Kirkland Lake Ontario P2N 3P4
(705) 568-2131

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad De Cartagena, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 313
145 Government Road East
Kirkland Lake Ontario P2N 3P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 568-2131
Fax: (705) 568-2133

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Antonio Visbal Moreno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Visbal Moreno (CPSO#: 81624 )
Business Address: 313 - 145 Government Road East
Kirkland Lake Ontario P2N 3P4
(705) 568-2131

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTONIO LUIS VISBAL MORENO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VISBAL MORENO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTONIO LUIS VISBAL MORENO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VISBAL MORENO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad De Cartagena, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 May 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 May 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2004