THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:08:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Lebanese University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6-841 Sydney St
Cornwall ON K6H 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Highway 599 and 17
CHC Mary Berglund Clinic
Ignace ON P0T 1T0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George Rabbat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rabbat (CPSO#: 81633 )
Business Address: 151 Main St E
Hawkesbury ON K6A 1A1
Business Address: Dryden Regional Health Centre
58 Goodall Street
Dryden Ontario P8N 2Z6
(807) 223-4994
Business Address: 6-841 Sydney St
Cornwall ON K6H 3J7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Lebanese University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6-841 Sydney St
Cornwall ON K6H 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Highway 599 and 17
CHC Mary Berglund Clinic
Ignace ON P0T 1T0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George Rabbat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rabbat (CPSO#: 81633 )
Business Address: 151 Main St E
Hawkesbury ON K6A 1A1
Business Address: Dryden Regional Health Centre
58 Goodall Street
Dryden Ontario P8N 2Z6
(807) 223-4994
Business Address: 6-841 Sydney St
Cornwall ON K6H 3J7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE RAYMOND RABBAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RABBAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE RAYMOND RABBAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RABBAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Lebanese University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Sep 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2004