THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:23:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of North Carolina, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
T2-11
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-6916
Fax: 416-480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 20 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie Coburn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Coburn (CPSO#: 81634 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Avenue
Division of General Surgery
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of North Carolina, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
T2-11
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-6916
Fax: 416-480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 20 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie Coburn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Coburn (CPSO#: 81634 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Avenue
Division of General Surgery
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE SUZANNE GROCE COBURN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COBURN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE SUZANNE GROCE COBURN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COBURN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of North Carolina, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2004