THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:09:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Extension: 6595
Fax: (905) 952-2818

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 31 May 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zishan Allibhai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Allibhai (CPSO#: 81664 )
Business Address: 5-620 - 610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-4501
Business Address: Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Extension: 6595
Fax: (905) 952-2818

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 31 May 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zishan Allibhai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Allibhai (CPSO#: 81664 )
Business Address: 5-620 - 610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-4501
Business Address: Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZISHAN ALLIBHAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLIBHAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZISHAN ALLIBHAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLIBHAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2004