THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:54:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Kerala, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAYALAM

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 7106
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-2747
Fax: (519) 376-2097

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site Chesley
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site
LOCATION: Chesley

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suni Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Johnson (CPSO#: 81670 )
Business Address: Suite 7106
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2747

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAYALAM
Medical School: University of Kerala, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 7106
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-2747
Fax: (519) 376-2097

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site Chesley
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site
LOCATION: Chesley

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suni Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Johnson (CPSO#: 81670 )
Business Address: Suite 7106
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2747

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUNI JOHN JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUNI JOHN JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Kerala, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jul 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2004