THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:08:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, ASSYRIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2537 Hamilton Regional Road 56
Unit B6
Binbrook Family Health
Binbrook Ontario L0R 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056922580
Fax: 9056920258

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dalia Bernard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bernard (CPSO#: 81677 )
Business Address: 19 Meadowbrook Court
Dunnville Ontario N1A 3H6
905-5163120
Business Address: Haldimand Family Health Team
334 Broad Street West
Dunnville Ontario N1A 1T1
(905) 774-7541

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, ASSYRIAN
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2537 Hamilton Regional Road 56
Unit B6
Binbrook Family Health
Binbrook Ontario L0R 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056922580
Fax: 9056920258

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dalia Bernard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bernard (CPSO#: 81677 )
Business Address: 19 Meadowbrook Court
Dunnville Ontario N1A 3H6
905-5163120
Business Address: Haldimand Family Health Team
334 Broad Street West
Dunnville Ontario N1A 1T1
(905) 774-7541

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DALIA ANTONIO BERNARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERNARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DALIA ANTONIO BERNARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERNARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2004