THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 12:42:53 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 525 Colborne Street
Brantford Ontario N3S 3P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 756-6770
Fax: (519) 756-1051

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Allen Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lam (CPSO#: 81678 )
Business Address: 525 Colborne Street
Brantford Ontario N3S 3P3
(519) 756-6770

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 525 Colborne Street
Brantford Ontario N3S 3P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 756-6770
Fax: (519) 756-1051

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Allen Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lam (CPSO#: 81678 )
Business Address: 525 Colborne Street
Brantford Ontario N3S 3P3
(519) 756-6770

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLEN KHANH LAN LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLEN KHANH LAN LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2004
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2004