THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:23:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tufts University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brantford General Hospital
Mental Health Services East Wing
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 751-5885
Fax: (519) 751-5898

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 24 Apr 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 24 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. K. Briskin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Briskin (CPSO#: 81692 )
Business Address: Brant Community Healthcare System
The Brant General - Department of Psychiatry
200 Terrace Hill Street
E Wing
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5885

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Tufts University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brantford General Hospital
Mental Health Services East Wing
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 751-5885
Fax: (519) 751-5898

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 24 Apr 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 24 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. K. Briskin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Briskin (CPSO#: 81692 )
Business Address: Brant Community Healthcare System
The Brant General - Department of Psychiatry
200 Terrace Hill Street
E Wing
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5885

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN KALOUYMUS BRISKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRISKIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN KALOUYMUS BRISKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRISKIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tufts University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2004