THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:47:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163991700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre
LOCATION: Little Current

HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rishi Narine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Narine (CPSO#: 81698 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163991700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre
LOCATION: Little Current

HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rishi Narine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Narine (CPSO#: 81698 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RISHI AVINASH NARINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARINE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RISHI AVINASH NARINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARINE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2004