THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:35:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6990 Derry Road
Suite 105
Milton Ontario L9T 7H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 429-0284
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadjafabadi Farahani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Nadjafabadi Farahani (CPSO#: 81711 )
Business Address: 105 - 6990 Derry Road
Milton Ontario L9T 7H3
(289) 429-0284
Business Address: Suite 1
2810 Major MacKenzie Drive
Maple Ontario L6A 3L2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6990 Derry Road
Suite 105
Milton Ontario L9T 7H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 429-0284
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadjafabadi Farahani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Nadjafabadi Farahani (CPSO#: 81711 )
Business Address: 105 - 6990 Derry Road
Milton Ontario L9T 7H3
(289) 429-0284
Business Address: Suite 1
2810 Major MacKenzie Drive
Maple Ontario L6A 3L2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PENDAR NADJAFABADI FARAHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADJAFABADI FARAHANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PENDAR NADJAFABADI FARAHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADJAFABADI FARAHANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2004