THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:24:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 16 O'Brien Street
Suite 202
Orillia Ontario L3V 5S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7053304060
Fax: 7057285100

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ingles Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ingles (CPSO#: 81738 )
Business Address: Suite 200
16 O'Brien Street
Orillia Ontario L3V 5S2
(705) 330-4060
Business Address: 16 O'Brien Street
Suite 202
Orillia Ontario L3V 5S2
7053304060

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 16 O'Brien Street
Suite 202
Orillia Ontario L3V 5S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7053304060
Fax: 7057285100

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ingles Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ingles (CPSO#: 81738 )
Business Address: Suite 200
16 O'Brien Street
Orillia Ontario L3V 5S2
(705) 330-4060
Business Address: 16 O'Brien Street
Suite 202
Orillia Ontario L3V 5S2
7053304060

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIA ANNE INGLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INGLES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIA ANNE INGLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INGLES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Aug 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2004