THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:12:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Calicut University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MALAYALAM

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dept of Medicine
628 Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Wing
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 44130
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 711 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: 9055212100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Mohammed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Feb 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MALAYALAM
Medical School: Calicut University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dept of Medicine
628 Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Wing
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 44130
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 711 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: 9055212100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Mohammed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Feb 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAUFAL MOHAMMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAUFAL MOHAMMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Calicut University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2004
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2004