THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:52:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 223 West Street Upper
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 440-3055
Fax: (226) 440-3056
Address: 1144 Wilson St W
Ancaster Ontario L9G 3K9
Phone: (905) 304-0062
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2227 South Millway
Mississauga Ontario L5L 3R6
Phone: 9055697007
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1148 Winston Churchill Blvd
Oakville Ontario L6J 0A3
Phone: (905) 849-3066
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Haldimand General Hospital Hagersville
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: West Haldimand General Hospital
LOCATION: Hagersville

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Kassem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al-Kassem (CPSO#: 81756 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, GERMAN
Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 223 West Street Upper
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 440-3055
Fax: (226) 440-3056
Address: 1144 Wilson St W
Ancaster Ontario L9G 3K9
Phone: (905) 304-0062
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2227 South Millway
Mississauga Ontario L5L 3R6
Phone: 9055697007
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1148 Winston Churchill Blvd
Oakville Ontario L6J 0A3
Phone: (905) 849-3066
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Haldimand General Hospital Hagersville
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: West Haldimand General Hospital
LOCATION: Hagersville

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Kassem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al-Kassem (CPSO#: 81756 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANAS AL-KASSEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-KASSEM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANAS AL-KASSEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-KASSEM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 26 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2004