THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:55:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1939 Kennedy Rd
Unit 102
Scarborough ON M1P 2L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 341-3111
Fax: 647-660-8440

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Subhathini Senthillmohan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Senthillmohan (CPSO#: 81764 )
Business Address: Brimley Road Medical Group
3333 Brimley Road
Toronto Ontario M1V 2J7
(416) 412-3333
Business Address: 136 Orton Park Rd
Scarborough ON M1G 3H1
4164398888
Business Address: 1-1939 Kennedy Rd
Unit 102
Scarborough ON M1P 2L9
6473413111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1939 Kennedy Rd
Unit 102
Scarborough ON M1P 2L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 341-3111
Fax: 647-660-8440

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Subhathini Senthillmohan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Senthillmohan (CPSO#: 81764 )
Business Address: Brimley Road Medical Group
3333 Brimley Road
Toronto Ontario M1V 2J7
(416) 412-3333
Business Address: 136 Orton Park Rd
Scarborough ON M1G 3H1
4164398888
Business Address: 1-1939 Kennedy Rd
Unit 102
Scarborough ON M1P 2L9
6473413111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUBHATHINI SENTHILLMOHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SENTHILLMOHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUBHATHINI SENTHILLMOHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SENTHILLMOHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2004
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2004