THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 02:58:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of The East Philippines, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAGALOG

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 9X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 430-4055
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1792 Liverpool Rd
Pickering ON L1V 4G6
Phone: 905-837-0777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
LOCATION: Whitby

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. L. Dominguez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dominguez (CPSO#: 81770 )
Business Address: 601 Harwood Avenue South
Suite 201
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J5
(905) 427-1419
Business Address: Rouge Valley Health System
Ajax and Pickering Site
Dept. of Hospital Medicine
580 Hardwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: 610 University Ave 4169462000 Extn: 3919
Business Address: 700 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 9X4
9054304055 Extn: 6158

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAGALOG
Medical School: University of The East Philippines, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 9X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 430-4055
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1792 Liverpool Rd
Pickering ON L1V 4G6
Phone: 905-837-0777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
LOCATION: Whitby

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. L. Dominguez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dominguez (CPSO#: 81770 )
Business Address: 601 Harwood Avenue South
Suite 201
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J5
(905) 427-1419
Business Address: Rouge Valley Health System
Ajax and Pickering Site
Dept. of Hospital Medicine
580 Hardwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: 610 University Ave 4169462000 Extn: 3919
Business Address: 700 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 9X4
9054304055 Extn: 6158

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADA LYNN DOMINGUEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOMINGUEZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADA LYNN DOMINGUEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOMINGUEZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of The East Philippines, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2004
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Oct 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2004