THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:39:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
Halton Healthcare
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: (905) 845-6419
Address: 217 Main St E
North Halton Mental Health Clinic
Milton Office
Milton ON L9T 1N9
Phone: 9056934240
Fax: 9056930596

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 28 Apr 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 28 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Darina M. De Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. De Souza (CPSO#: 81772 )
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Halton Health Care
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571 Extn: 5630

Corporation Name: F.M. de Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Dec 2014

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
Halton Healthcare
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: (905) 845-6419
Address: 217 Main St E
North Halton Mental Health Clinic
Milton Office
Milton ON L9T 1N9
Phone: 9056934240
Fax: 9056930596

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 28 Apr 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 28 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Darina M. De Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. De Souza (CPSO#: 81772 )
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Halton Health Care
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571 Extn: 5630

Corporation Name: F.M. de Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Dec 2014

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARINA MARIE DE SOUZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE SOUZA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARINA MARIE DE SOUZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE SOUZA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2004