THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:34:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 308 Guelph street
Georgetown Ontario L7G 4B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 877-2220
Fax: (905) 877-5554

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jan 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 22 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wafik F. Abdel Malek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Abdel Malek (CPSO#: 81822 )
Business Address: 308 Guleph Street
Georgetown Ontario L7G 4B1
(905) 877-2220

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 308 Guelph street
Georgetown Ontario L7G 4B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 877-2220
Fax: (905) 877-5554

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jan 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 22 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wafik F. Abdel Malek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Abdel Malek (CPSO#: 81822 )
Business Address: 308 Guleph Street
Georgetown Ontario L7G 4B1
(905) 877-2220

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAFIK FRANCE ABDEL MALEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL MALEK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAFIK FRANCE ABDEL MALEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL MALEK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2004