THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:08:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 19058131100
Extension: 1841
Fax: 19058134024

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 01 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Behzadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Behzadi (CPSO#: 81843 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
Peel Regional Cancer Centre
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-1100 Extn: 1841

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 19058131100
Extension: 1841
Fax: 19058134024

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 01 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Behzadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Behzadi (CPSO#: 81843 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
Peel Regional Cancer Centre
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-1100 Extn: 1841

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDOLLAH BEHZADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEHZADI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDOLLAH BEHZADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEHZADI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2004
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2004