THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:06:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa Ontario L1H 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 721-4300
Fax: (905) 721-6695

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 Aug 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Camelia Trambitas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Trambitas (CPSO#: 81844 )
Business Address: 1290 Keith Ross Dr
Oshawa ON L1J 0C7
905 723 8551 Extn: 5264

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa Ontario L1H 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 721-4300
Fax: (905) 721-6695

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 Aug 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Camelia Trambitas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Trambitas (CPSO#: 81844 )
Business Address: 1290 Keith Ross Dr
Oshawa ON L1J 0C7
905 723 8551 Extn: 5264

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAMELIA ALEXANDRA TRAMBITAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAMBITAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAMELIA ALEXANDRA TRAMBITAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAMBITAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2004