THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:25:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Leicester, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
Armstrong 3
76 Stuart St
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 3377
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 108-2100 Finch Ave W
The Healthy Way
North York ON M3N 2Z9
Phone: 4166679598
Fax: 4166679525
Address: 106-1120 Finch Ave W
The Healthy Way
North York ON M3J 3H7
Phone: 4166678498
Fax: 4166670334
Address: 103-1615 Dufferin St
The Healthy Way
Toronto ON M6H 4H4
Phone: 4166546019
Fax: 4166544505

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 04 Apr 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Apr 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 04 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 04 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Redfearn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Apr 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Redfearn (CPSO#: 81848 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 3377

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Leicester, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
Armstrong 3
76 Stuart St
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 3377
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 108-2100 Finch Ave W
The Healthy Way
North York ON M3N 2Z9
Phone: 4166679598
Fax: 4166679525
Address: 106-1120 Finch Ave W
The Healthy Way
North York ON M3J 3H7
Phone: 4166678498
Fax: 4166670334
Address: 103-1615 Dufferin St
The Healthy Way
Toronto ON M6H 4H4
Phone: 4166546019
Fax: 4166544505

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 04 Apr 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Apr 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 04 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 04 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Redfearn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Apr 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Redfearn (CPSO#: 81848 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 3377

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Feb 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 10 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Damian Paul Redfearn may practise medicine independently in cardiology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Damian Paul Redfearn may practise medicine independently in cardiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Leicester, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Feb 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2004