THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:27:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Cardiology
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: (613) 738-4835

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gardin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gardin (CPSO#: 81850 )
Business Address: 401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
6137377600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Cardiology
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: (613) 738-4835

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gardin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gardin (CPSO#: 81850 )
Business Address: 401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
6137377600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LETIZIA LUCIA GARDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARDIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LETIZIA LUCIA GARDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARDIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2004
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2004