THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:43:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-649 Colborne St
London ON N6A 3Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-850-8575
Fax: 519-850-6583
Address: Advanced Medical Group
230 Victoria Street
London Ontario N6A 2C2
Phone: 519-873-1700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Saskatchewan
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Banner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Banner (CPSO#: 81881 )
Business Address: Suite 202
400 York Street
London Ontario N6B 3N2
(519) 850-6575
Business Address: 1-649 Colborne St
London ON N6A 3Z2
519-850-6575

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-649 Colborne St
London ON N6A 3Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-850-8575
Fax: 519-850-6583
Address: Advanced Medical Group
230 Victoria Street
London Ontario N6A 2C2
Phone: 519-873-1700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Saskatchewan
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Banner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Banner (CPSO#: 81881 )
Business Address: Suite 202
400 York Street
London Ontario N6B 3N2
(519) 850-6575
Business Address: 1-649 Colborne St
London ON N6A 3Z2
519-850-6575

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT BANNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANNER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT BANNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANNER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2004