THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:06:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saddam College of Medicine, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, ARMENIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 26 Oct 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rafi Setrak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Setrak (CPSO#: 81883 )
Business Address: Niagara Health System
St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9

Corporation Name: Dr. Rafi Setrak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Sep 2018

Corporation Name: Van Sittert Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jul 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, ARMENIAN
Medical School: Saddam College of Medicine, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 26 Oct 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rafi Setrak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Setrak (CPSO#: 81883 )
Business Address: Niagara Health System
St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9

Corporation Name: Dr. Rafi Setrak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Sep 2018

Corporation Name: Van Sittert Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jul 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAFI FAHRAM SETRAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SETRAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAFI FAHRAM SETRAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SETRAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saddam College of Medicine, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2004
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2004