THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:47:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Halton Family health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 336-3437
Extension: 2040
Fax: (905) 639-0608
Address: Dundas Medical Centre
And Walk In Clinic
252 Dundas Street East SS 2
Waterdown Ontario L0R 2H4
Phone: (905) 689-8833
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 252 dundas street east
Waterdown Ontario L9H 7K7
Phone: (905) 689-8833
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Huma Numair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Numair (CPSO#: 81890 )
Business Address: Halton Family Health
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
(905) 592-3948

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Halton Family health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 336-3437
Extension: 2040
Fax: (905) 639-0608
Address: Dundas Medical Centre
And Walk In Clinic
252 Dundas Street East SS 2
Waterdown Ontario L0R 2H4
Phone: (905) 689-8833
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 252 dundas street east
Waterdown Ontario L9H 7K7
Phone: (905) 689-8833
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Huma Numair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Numair (CPSO#: 81890 )
Business Address: Halton Family Health
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
(905) 592-3948

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUMA NAHEED NUMAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NUMAIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUMA NAHEED NUMAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NUMAIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2004