THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:55:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 220 Duncan Mill Road
Suite 420
Toronto Ontario M3B 3J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-502-8100
Fax: 416-502-8110

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel CT Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wong (CPSO#: 81896 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 220 Duncan Mill Road
Suite 420
Toronto Ontario M3B 3J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-502-8100
Fax: 416-502-8110

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel CT Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wong (CPSO#: 81896 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL CHET-TI WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL CHET-TI WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2004