THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/05/25 19:08:18 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 61 5th Street
Englehart Ontario P0J 1H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055442301
Fax: 7055445215
Address: Englehart and District Hospital
61 Fifth Street
Englehart Ontario P0J1H0
Phone: 7055442301
Fax: 7055445222
Address: 725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B2Y6
Phone: 7057533110
Fax: 7057535735

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
HOSPITAL: Englehart and District Hospital
LOCATION: Englehart

HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Scott Daley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Daley (CPSO#: 81922 )
Business Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600
Business Address: West Nipissing General Hospital
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B 2Y6
(705) 753-3110
Business Address: Ferris Medical Clinic
1500 Fisher Street
North Bay Ontario P1B 2H3
(705) 495-4000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 61 5th Street
Englehart Ontario P0J 1H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055442301
Fax: 7055445215
Address: Englehart and District Hospital
61 Fifth Street
Englehart Ontario P0J1H0
Phone: 7055442301
Fax: 7055445222
Address: 725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B2Y6
Phone: 7057533110
Fax: 7057535735

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
HOSPITAL: Englehart and District Hospital
LOCATION: Englehart

HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Scott Daley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Daley (CPSO#: 81922 )
Business Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600
Business Address: West Nipissing General Hospital
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B 2Y6
(705) 753-3110
Business Address: Ferris Medical Clinic
1500 Fisher Street
North Bay Ontario P1B 2H3
(705) 495-4000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SCOTT EDWARD DALEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SCOTT EDWARD DALEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Oct 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2004