THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:58:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Minsk State Medical Institute, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BELARUSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Dixie Road
Dixie Road Medical Associates
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-279-1701
Fax: 905-897-9950

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kolb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kolb (CPSO#: 81932 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BELARUSIAN
Medical School: Minsk State Medical Institute, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Dixie Road
Dixie Road Medical Associates
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-279-1701
Fax: 905-897-9950

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kolb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kolb (CPSO#: 81932 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELENA KOLB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELENA KOLB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Minsk State Medical Institute, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2004