THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:39:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
Paediatric Department
327 Reynolds St.
Oakville Ontario L6J 3L7
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hospital for Sick Children
Paediatric Emergency Department
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Joseph's Health Center
Paediatric Department
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gonzalez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gonzalez (CPSO#: 81934 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
Paediatric Department
327 Reynolds St.
Oakville Ontario L6J 3L7
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hospital for Sick Children
Paediatric Emergency Department
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Joseph's Health Center
Paediatric Department
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gonzalez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gonzalez (CPSO#: 81934 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SILVIO ARQUIMEDES GONZALEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONZALEZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SILVIO ARQUIMEDES GONZALEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONZALEZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2004