THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:40:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bangalore University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa Ontario L1J 0C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 721-6863
Fax: (905) 721-6692

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Nov 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Sadiq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sadiq (CPSO#: 81947 )
Business Address: Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa Ontario L1H 7K4
(905) 721-6863

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA, URDU
Medical School: Bangalore University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa Ontario L1J 0C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 721-6863
Fax: (905) 721-6692

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Nov 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Sadiq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sadiq (CPSO#: 81947 )
Business Address: Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa Ontario L1H 7K4
(905) 721-6863

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAJEMUS SADIQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADIQ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAJEMUS SADIQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADIQ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bangalore University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2004