THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:11:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sind, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A+Medical Centre & Walk-In
1079 Maple Ave
Milton Ontario L9T 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 864-9008
Fax: (905) 864-9004

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Sep 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 29 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Siddiqui and Dr. Aliya Adil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Adil (CPSO#: 81951 ) Dr. A. Siddiqui (CPSO#: 99225 )
Business Address: 250 Wincott Drive
Suite 12
Etobicoke Ontario M9R 2R5
(416) 249-0002
Business Address: 1079 Maple Avenue
Milton Ontario L9T 0A5
(905) 864-9007

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Sind, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A+Medical Centre & Walk-In
1079 Maple Ave
Milton Ontario L9T 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 864-9008
Fax: (905) 864-9004

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Sep 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 29 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Siddiqui and Dr. Aliya Adil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Adil (CPSO#: 81951 ) Dr. A. Siddiqui (CPSO#: 99225 )
Business Address: 250 Wincott Drive
Suite 12
Etobicoke Ontario M9R 2R5
(416) 249-0002
Business Address: 1079 Maple Avenue
Milton Ontario L9T 0A5
(905) 864-9007

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALIYA ADIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALIYA ADIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sind, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2004