THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:42:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: Brambilla, Christa Colleen (Used Until: 12 Feb 2013) Ng, Christa Colleen (Used Until: 27 Jun 2006)
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 870
Dawson City Community Hospital
501 Sixth Avenue
Dawson YT Y0B 1G0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 867-993-4444
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christa Ng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ng (CPSO#: 81952 )
Business Address: Cornerstone Family Medical Centre
Suite 106
100 Strowger Boulevard
Brockville Ontario K6V 5J9
(613) 498-0444
Business Address: 5 Home Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 0A5
(613) 423-1111
Business Address: PO Box 870
Dawson City Community Hospital
501 Sixth Avenue
Dawson YT Y0B 1G0
867-993-4444

General Information

Former Name: Brambilla, Christa Colleen (Used Until: 12 Feb 2013) Ng, Christa Colleen (Used Until: 27 Jun 2006)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 870
Dawson City Community Hospital
501 Sixth Avenue
Dawson YT Y0B 1G0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 867-993-4444
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christa Ng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ng (CPSO#: 81952 )
Business Address: Cornerstone Family Medical Centre
Suite 106
100 Strowger Boulevard
Brockville Ontario K6V 5J9
(613) 498-0444
Business Address: 5 Home Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 0A5
(613) 423-1111
Business Address: PO Box 870
Dawson City Community Hospital
501 Sixth Avenue
Dawson YT Y0B 1G0
867-993-4444

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTA COLLEEN NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTA COLLEEN NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2004
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2004