THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:43:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, ARMENIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2039 Robertson Road
Suite 250
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137281795
Fax: 6137280091

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 08 Nov 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Krikor Kichian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kichian (CPSO#: 81955 )
Business Address: 212-2039 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 5Y9
(613) 728-1795
Business Address: 1 Sunny Brae Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8H3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, ARMENIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2039 Robertson Road
Suite 250
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137281795
Fax: 6137280091

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 08 Nov 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Krikor Kichian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kichian (CPSO#: 81955 )
Business Address: 212-2039 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 5Y9
(613) 728-1795
Business Address: 1 Sunny Brae Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8H3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRIKOR KICHIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KICHIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRIKOR KICHIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KICHIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2004
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2004