THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:35:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa Ontario L1H 2J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 579-1212
Extension: 273
Fax: 289-731-2036

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Durrani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Oct 2022

Corporation Name: Dr. Ahmad Durrani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Oct 2015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa Ontario L1H 2J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 579-1212
Extension: 273
Fax: 289-731-2036

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Durrani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Oct 2022

Corporation Name: Dr. Ahmad Durrani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Oct 2015

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMAD IRFAN DURRANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DURRANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMAD IRFAN DURRANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DURRANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2004