THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 18:42:10 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 83 Brock Street
Oakville Ontario L6K 2Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2899810888
Fax: No Information Available
Address: C105-666 Appleby Line
Burlington ON L7L 5Y3
Phone: 9056349898
Fax: 9056342121
Address: 1070 STONECHURCH RD ,EAST
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3K8
Phone: (905)645-0520
Fax: 905-645-0524
Address: 9-110 Ansley Grove Rd
Woodbridge ON L4L 3R1
Phone: 9056058444
Fax: 19056052520

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wassim Soliman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Soliman (CPSO#: 81965 )
Business Address: Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571 Extn: 4900
Business Address: 26-1070 Stonechurch Road East
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3K8
(905) 645-0520

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 83 Brock Street
Oakville Ontario L6K 2Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2899810888
Fax: No Information Available
Address: C105-666 Appleby Line
Burlington ON L7L 5Y3
Phone: 9056349898
Fax: 9056342121
Address: 1070 STONECHURCH RD ,EAST
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3K8
Phone: (905)645-0520
Fax: 905-645-0524
Address: 9-110 Ansley Grove Rd
Woodbridge ON L4L 3R1
Phone: 9056058444
Fax: 19056052520

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wassim Soliman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Soliman (CPSO#: 81965 )
Business Address: Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571 Extn: 4900
Business Address: 26-1070 Stonechurch Road East
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3K8
(905) 645-0520

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 Oct 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 17 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Wassim George Farid Soliman way practise medicine independently in
psychiatry, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Wassim George Farid Soliman way practise medicine independently in
psychiatry, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2004