THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:32:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1000 Middlegate Rd
Second Floor
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-804-7000
Fax: 905-804-2250

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Bayliss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bayliss (CPSO#: 81986 )
Business Address: 150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 1A4
(416) 626-6323
Business Address: 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: 1000 Middlegate Road
2nd Floor
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1M3
(905) 804-7000
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1000 Middlegate Rd
Second Floor
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-804-7000
Fax: 905-804-2250

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Bayliss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bayliss (CPSO#: 81986 )
Business Address: 150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 1A4
(416) 626-6323
Business Address: 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: 1000 Middlegate Road
2nd Floor
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1M3
(905) 804-7000
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL LEWIS BAYLISS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAYLISS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL LEWIS BAYLISS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAYLISS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2004