THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:53:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196234200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Oct 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Alavi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Alavi (CPSO#: 81994 )
Business Address: 167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3H7
(519) 623-4200

Corporation Name: Monkhouse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Apr 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196234200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Oct 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Alavi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Alavi (CPSO#: 81994 )
Business Address: 167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3H7
(519) 623-4200

Corporation Name: Monkhouse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Apr 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAZIA ALAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAVI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAZIA ALAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAVI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2004