THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:20:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Dermatology Centre
Suite 400
4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 633-0001
Fax: (416) 633-0002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Freiman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Freiman (CPSO#: 82004 )
Business Address: Toronto Dermatology Centre
400 - 4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5Y8
(416) 633-0001

Corporation Name: Barankin & Freiman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jul 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Dermatology Centre
Suite 400
4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 633-0001
Fax: (416) 633-0002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Freiman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Freiman (CPSO#: 82004 )
Business Address: Toronto Dermatology Centre
400 - 4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5Y8
(416) 633-0001

Corporation Name: Barankin & Freiman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jul 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANATOLI FREIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREIMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANATOLI FREIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREIMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Nov 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2004