THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:54:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-50 Sky Harbour Dr
Brampton ON L6Y 6G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058136886
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Oct 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y. Jabbar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Jabbar (CPSO#: 82008 )
Business Address: 199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 0E3
(905) 873-3000
Business Address: 2-90 Resolution Dr
Brampton ON L6W 0A7
4168833877

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-50 Sky Harbour Dr
Brampton ON L6Y 6G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058136886
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Oct 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y. Jabbar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Jabbar (CPSO#: 82008 )
Business Address: 199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 0E3
(905) 873-3000
Business Address: 2-90 Resolution Dr
Brampton ON L6W 0A7
4168833877

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YASMEEN JABBAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABBAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YASMEEN JABBAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABBAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2004