THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:24:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Tremont Medical Clinic
2A 2F Tremont Drive
St. Catharines Ontario L2T 3B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 687-8887
Fax: (905) 641-3693

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wouter Oelofse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Oelofse (CPSO#: 82011 )
Business Address: Tremont Medical Clinic
2A-2F Tremont Drive
St Catharines Ontario L2T 3B2
(905) 687-8887

Corporation Name: Van Sittert Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jul 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Tremont Medical Clinic
2A 2F Tremont Drive
St. Catharines Ontario L2T 3B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 687-8887
Fax: (905) 641-3693

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wouter Oelofse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Oelofse (CPSO#: 82011 )
Business Address: Tremont Medical Clinic
2A-2F Tremont Drive
St Catharines Ontario L2T 3B2
(905) 687-8887

Corporation Name: Van Sittert Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jul 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WOUTER OELOFSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OELOFSE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WOUTER OELOFSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OELOFSE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2004
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2004