THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:07:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jimma University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AMHARIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: New Vision Family Health Team
Unit 23B
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 578-3510
Fax: (519) 578-6040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Oct 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yidersal Gebeyehu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Gebeyehu (CPSO#: 82015 )
Business Address: New Vision Family Health Team
23B - 421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
(519) 578-3510

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AMHARIC
Medical School: Jimma University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: New Vision Family Health Team
Unit 23B
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 578-3510
Fax: (519) 578-6040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Oct 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yidersal Gebeyehu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Gebeyehu (CPSO#: 82015 )
Business Address: New Vision Family Health Team
23B - 421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
(519) 578-3510

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YIDERSAL MELLESE GEBEYEHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEBEYEHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YIDERSAL MELLESE GEBEYEHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEBEYEHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 19 May 2017
Summary:
Effective August 16, 2019, Dr. Gebeyehu has completed all elements of this SCERP.
 
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
 
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 19 May 2017
Summary:
Effective August 16, 2019, Dr. Gebeyehu has completed all elements of this SCERP.
 
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
 
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: Jimma University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2004