THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:12:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, SWAHILI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1575 Upper Ottawa St
Unit A5
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 578-5776
Fax: (905) 578-5779

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Dhalla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dhalla (CPSO#: 82017 )

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, SWAHILI, URDU
Medical School: Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1575 Upper Ottawa St
Unit A5
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 578-5776
Fax: (905) 578-5779

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Dhalla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dhalla (CPSO#: 82017 )

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHSIN NISARHUSEIN DHALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHSIN NISARHUSEIN DHALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2004