THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:39:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 608
89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-1884
Fax: (905) 848-6360
Address: Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 848-7580
Extension: 7557
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4466
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 08 Dec 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Werneck Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Werneck (CPSO#: 82044 )
Business Address: Suite 608
89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
(905) 848-1884

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 608
89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-1884
Fax: (905) 848-6360
Address: Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 848-7580
Extension: 7557
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4466
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 08 Dec 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Werneck Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Werneck (CPSO#: 82044 )
Business Address: Suite 608
89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
(905) 848-1884

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 Jul 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 23 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Christiane Campolina Furquim Werneck may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
Division of Vascular Surgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
Werneck holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Werneck no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Christiane Campolina Furquim Werneck may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
Division of Vascular Surgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
Werneck holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Werneck no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2004
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2004