THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:46:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Bergen, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: RVH - Centenary Hospital
Suite 303
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 436-3397
Fax: (647) 436-3403

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mansula Manogaran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Manogaran (CPSO#: 82051 )
Business Address: 303 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 5E9
(647) 436-3397

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Bergen, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: RVH - Centenary Hospital
Suite 303
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 436-3397
Fax: (647) 436-3403

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mansula Manogaran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Manogaran (CPSO#: 82051 )
Business Address: 303 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 5E9
(647) 436-3397

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANSULA MANOGARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANOGARAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANSULA MANOGARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANOGARAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Bergen, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2004
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2004